Financial history THE HUB, HAZELWELL

Charity Number: 1078799
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £109.26k £102.70k £140.35k £150.24k £167.15k
Total expenditure £130.81k £128.66k £140.54k £154.18k £180.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £26.40k £511 N/A £2.00k