Financial history THAMES ESTUARY PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1083199
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £407.93k £313.24k £597.62k £645.65k £660.36k
Total expenditure £399.31k £321.63k £609.01k £564.72k £640.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £155.57k £100.63k £484.89k £418.67k £634.83k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £597.62k £645.50k £660.36k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £8 £156 £1
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £609.01k £564.72k £640.55k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £6.57k £3.61k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0