YORKSHIRE BUILDERS SAFETY AND TRAINING TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing education & training and making grants to organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 03 February 2000: Standard registration
- 07 October 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.22k | £2.52k | £46 | £1 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.27k | £44.69k | £27.35k | £1.99k | £7.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 21 April 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 21 April 2009 | 172 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 21 May 2009 | 568 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 31 January 2006 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 31 January 2006 | 92 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24 DECEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROMOTION OF SAFETY AND ACCIDENT PREVENTION IN THE CONSTRUCTION INDUSTRY IN THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREA COVERED BY THE YORKSHIRE REGION OF THE NATIONAL FEDERATION OF BUILDERS AND IN PARTICULAR INDUSTRIES AND BUSINESSES WITHIN THAT AREA AFFILIATED TO THE CONSTRUCTION CONFEDERATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY:- (A) THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, ALLOWANCES AND PRIZES TO STUDENTS WHO ARE PURSUING COURSES OF INSTRUCTION IN THE INDUSTRIES (B) THE ORGANISATION AND SPONSORSHIP OF PROJECTS, MEETINGS, LECTURES, COURSES AND DEMONSTRATIONS, AND THE DISSEMINATION OF KNOWLEDGE RELATING TO TRAINING AND/OR ACCIDENT PREVENTION AND SAFE WORKING PRACTICES
Area of benefit
GEOGRAPHICAL AREA COVERED BY THE YORKSHIRE REGION OF THE NATIONAL FEDERATION OF BUILDERS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window