GREAT EDSTONE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management of Great Edstone Village Hall
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 19 October 1999: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Kynnersley Harrison | Trustee | 03 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Kay | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Stuart Taylor | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD WOOSNAM | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Pauline Edwards-Harrison | Trustee | 05 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALAN DOWKES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.50k | £10.06k | £425 | £1.24k | £1.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.58k | £788 | £1.23k | £2.78k | £1.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 February 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE MADE 16 MAY 1963
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITICAL OR RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURETIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
GREAT EDSTONE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Westfield
Great Edstone
YORK
YO62 6NZ
- Phone:
- 07807941655
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window