THE BALSHAM PAROCHIAL CHARITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of hardship and promotion of activities for the elderly and young persons resident in the village of Balsham, Cambridgeshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 22 September 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Colin Wilcox | Trustee | 31 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
David James Kiddy | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
RUTH MARIAN RINGER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN CECIL DOWN FRILS FAAV | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.81k | £2.83k | £3.04k | £2.03k | £2.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.28k | £1.81k | £2.71k | £1.05k | £3.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 November 2024 | 292 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 May 2023 | 90 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 March 2021 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 23RD AUGUST 1999
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS; (2) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN NEED AND ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED OR INFIRM BY RELIEVING THEIR SUFFERING OR ASSISTING THEIR RECOVERY; AND (3) THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT EITHER BY PROVIDING FOR THE BALSHAM COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL (IN CONSOLATION WITH THE MANAGERS OF THE SAID SCHOOL AND THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY) SPECIAL BENEFITS NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY OR IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BALSHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 TRINITY CLOSE
BALSHAM
CAMBRIDGE
CB21 4DW
- Phone:
- 01223893915
- Email:
- ian.creek@mypostoffice.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window