THE PLAYHOUSE THEATRE CHELTENHAM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintaining the Grade-II listed Playhouse Theatre complex
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 12 October 2001: Standard registration
- 26 October 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 26 October 2023: Funds transferred to 1196217 THE PLAYHOUSE THEATRE CHELTENHAM
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £124.37k | £150.12k | £98.89k | £297.10k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £147.42k | £148.40k | £154.53k | £155.28k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.70k | £28.06k | £41.80k | £48.87k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 25 September 2023 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 07 February 2023 | 160 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 07 February 2023 | 160 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 November 2020 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 November 2020 | 12 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25/07/1999 AS AMENDED ON 30/09/2001 AS AMENDED ON 17/04/2011 AS AMENDED ON 23 APR 2017 as amended on 08 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE ARTS OF DRAMA, LITERATURE, DANCE MUSIC AND SINGING THROUGH THE PRODUCTION OF PLAYS AND OTHER ARTISTIC WORKS. TO PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROVIDE ACCESS TO SUCH FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. TO RESTORE AND PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PLAYHOUSE THEATRE IN CHELTENHAM BEING A BUILDING OF HISTORIC ARCHITECTURAL HERITAGE AND CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST.
Area of benefit
CHELTENHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window