BOURNE LIONS CLUB CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1077290
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To distribute income for any purpose which is charitable acording to the law of England and Wales whether for the benefit of any individual, or group of people, or for the benefit of any other organisation established for charitable purposes.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £14,390
Total expenditure: £20,675

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Amateur Sport
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 September 1999: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Kaye Trustee 01 July 2024
BOURNE LIONS CLUB (CIO)
Recently registered
Jonathan David Chudley Trustee 01 July 2023
BOURNE LIONS CLUB (CIO)
Recently registered
Graham Edward Crane Trustee 01 July 2017
BOURNE LIONS CLUB (CIO)
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £19.05k £1.92k £18.93k £16.17k £14.39k
Total expenditure £16.42k £2.36k £13.44k £11.46k £20.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 08 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 16 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 28 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 20 May 2022 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 08 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
4 Tilia Way
Bourne
PE10 0QR
Phone:
01778421521
Email:
No information available