YOUTH MUSIC CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide education for young persons in the playing of musical instruments, and the performance and understanding and appreciation of classical music.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 21 September 1999: Standard registration
- 10 May 2021: Funds received from 1055892 MARLOW MUSIC FESTIVAL ASSOCIATION
- YMC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN WARNER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Thomas Edward Longstaff | Trustee | 03 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anthony Burch | Trustee | 10 February 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr Amanda Polly Craig | Trustee | 03 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Sharpe | Trustee | 14 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ian Byrne Brito | Trustee | 01 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL LEO HURWITZ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIA EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.26k | £73.61k | £84.25k | £88.40k | £114.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.49k | £57.14k | £92.33k | £100.71k | £101.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 09 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 09 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 23 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 23 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30TH JULY 1999
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE EDUCATION FOR YOUNG PERSONS IN THE PLAYING OF MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS, AND THE PERFORMANCE AND UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF CLASSICAL MUSIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 Cranhurst Road
LONDON
NW2 4LP
- Phone:
- 07717 533 395
- Email:
- marina@youthmusiccentre.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window