Accounts and annual returns ABRIDGE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1077605
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2008 11 February 2009 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2008 11 February 2009 6 days late
Annual return 05 April 2007 11 February 2008 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2007 11 February 2008 6 days late
Annual return 05 April 2006 13 February 2007 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2006 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2005 15 February 2006 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2005 Not Required