Financial history ABRIDGE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1077605
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2004 05/04/2005 05/04/2006 05/04/2007 05/04/2008
Total gross income £24.67k £8.28k £6.17k £20.90k £25.49k
Total expenditure £19.33k £3.58k £1.62k £14.66k £26.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A