ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION NEWARK BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Social and welfare assistance for serving and ex-serving members of the Royal Air Force, their families and dependants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 07 September 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Reilly | Chair | 16 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Ward | Trustee | 18 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Allan Brooke | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elspeth White | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ann Flint | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Woods | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Flint | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Atkins | Trustee | 27 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.89k | £30.82k | £7.28k | £20.45k | £2.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.34k | £19.18k | £28.12k | £20.52k | £8.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 26 JUNE 1996 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 28 MAY 1997.
Charitable objects
AS PER RAFA (226686)
Area of benefit
NEWARK, NOTTINGHAMSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
134 Lincoln Road
NEWARK
Nottinghamshire
NG24 2DF
- Phone:
- 07957 423108
- Email:
- contact@rafanewark.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window