Financial history GOVERNORS FOR SCHOOLS

Charity Number: 1078330
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £480.43k £1.05m £754.19k £967.45k £1.31m
Total expenditure £922.78k £940.61k £949.75k £1.10m £1.31m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £958.43k £628.45k £821.30k £125.75k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £124.81k £145.73k £1.18m
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £63 £46 £414 £5.03k
Income - Other N/A £86.66k £887 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £866.91k £949.75k £1.10m £1.31m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £230
Expenditure - Governance N/A £4.98k £5.13k £5.28k £5.52k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £73.69k £0 £0 £0