THE FRIENDS OF ALL SAINTS CHURCH RENHOLD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The preservation repair maintenance restoration improvement and ornamentation of the fabric of the Parish Church of All Saints' Renhold Bedfordshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bedford
Governance
- 27 March 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Timms | Trustee | 02 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine Anne Smith | Trustee | 02 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ian Martin Smith | Trustee | 06 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Ann Timms | Trustee | 17 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Coleman | Trustee | 12 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALAN BLOOMFIELD | Trustee | 20 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Ferguson | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.65k | £150 | £2.36k | £1.31k | £1.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.06k | £0 | £2.96k | £1.37k | £7.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 JUNE 1999
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL STAND POSSESSED OF THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND AND ALL CONTRIBUTIONS AND SUBSCRIPTIONS FROM TIME TO TIME RECEIVED BY THEM FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY AS HEREINAFTER MENTIONED UPON TRUST TO APPLY OR CAUSE TO BE APPLIED THE SAME AT SUCH TIME AND IN SUCH MANNER AND UPON SUCH TERMS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DECIDE FOR THE PRESERVATION REPAIR MAINTENANCE RESTORATION IMPROVEMENT AND ORNAMENTATION OF THE FABRIC OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ALL SAINTS RENHOLD AFORESAID
Area of benefit
RENHOLD, BEDFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 ASGARD DRIVE
BEDFORD
MK41 0UP
- Phone:
- 07831495758
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window