CONNECT IN THE NORTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Connect in the North works to improve services and opportunities for people with learning difficulties. We offer training, research and consultancy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £145,485 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Barnsley
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North East Lincolnshire
- North Yorkshire
- Rotherham
Governance
- 10 January 2000: Standard registration
- THE LEEDS COALITION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Stephens | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kenny Hendy | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Buttery | Trustee | 31 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Maisie Hirschhorn | Trustee | 25 May 2018 |
|
|||||
VICTORIA HILES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £153.58k | £154.15k | £157.36k | £146.80k | £147.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.15k | £145.36k | £138.03k | £138.57k | £141.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £22.40k | £76.12k | N/A | £76.12k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £76.48k | £76.48k | N/A | £68.94k | £145.49k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07 NOV 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 MAR 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 NOV 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 NOV 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 JAN 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 JUL 2010
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES WITHIN THE LEEDS METROPOLITAN AREA AND THE NORTH OF ENGLAND
Area of benefit
LEEDS METROPOLITAN AREA AND NORTH OF ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Office 45
Sugar Mill Business Park
Oakhurst Road
LEEDS
LS11 7HL
- Phone:
- 01132703233
- Email:
- info@citn.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window