Governing document BOSOM PALS BEDFORD BRANCH

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 NOVEMBER 2000 AND AMENDED 11 MAY 2007 AS AMENDED 08 APRIL 2009 AS AMENDED ON 08/04/2015 as amended on 10 May 2017
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THOSE PERSONS IN NEED OFF SUCH FACILITIES DUE TO SUFFERING OR HAVING SUFFERED FROM BREAST CANCER AND THE FAMILIES OF THOSE PERSONS. SUCH FACILITIES SHALL INCLUDE RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES. (B) TO RELIEVE THOSE PERSONS IN NEED OR DISTRESSED DUE TO SUFFERING OR HAVING SUFFERED FROM BREAST CANCER THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, FACILITIES AND OTHER SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.