MALIAN COMMUNITY IN THE UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work to improve access to mainstream services and education for Malians, and raise awareness of their rights and responsibilities, promote participation, inclusion and independence living and enable Malians to express their needs effectively through personal support, information, signposting and referral. The service is free, independent, impartial, confidential and open to all
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
People

3 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 December 1999: Standard registration
- AMARU (Working name)
- COMMUNITY OF MALIAN REFUGEES IN THE U.K. (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OMAR KANE | Chair | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Paolo | Trustee | 17 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARIAM MBAYE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.00k | £24.80k | £24.95k | £24.99k | £24.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.99k | £21.97k | £22.91k | £22.85k | £22.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 191 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 191 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 557 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 557 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 922 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 922 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 January 2022 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22/09/1998 AS AMENDED ON 20/11/1999 AS AMENDED ON 30/08/2011
Charitable objects
• TO RELIEVE POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF THE MALIAN MIGRANTS (AMARU)RESIDENTS IN THE UK BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING FOR EMPLOYMENT NEEDS AS WELL AS ADVICE ON HEALTH MATTERS, HOUSING, INTERPRETING/TRANSLATION AND ADVOCACY. • TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR AMARU RESIDENTS IN THE UK.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 92
Talbot House
78 Hornsey Road
LONDON
N7 7LU
- Phone:
- 020 3645 9787
- Email:
- maliancommunity-uk@mail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window