Financial history CARN BREA VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1085642
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/03/2020 30/03/2021 30/03/2022 30/03/2023 30/03/2024
Total gross income £3.45k £0 £6.21k £2.43k £4.23k
Total expenditure £1.19k £535 £5.24k £2.09k £3.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A