ST. JOHN'S PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The setting provides childcare for families and adhere's to the early years framework. The setting provides training for staff to keep standards high and maintain quality. The setting provides activities to promote children's all round development as well as parental involvement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 21 March 2000: Standard registration
- ORTON ST JOHN'S PRE-SCHOOL (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carlene Whittock | Chair | 21 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Zuzana Kralikova | Trustee | 13 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catriona Bell | Trustee | 13 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Brooker | Trustee | 13 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £199.09k | £203.63k | £215.47k | £271.57k | £242.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £176.35k | £198.64k | £263.01k | £259.76k | £270.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £171.94k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £164.10k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 678 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 678 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1043 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1043 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 14 October 2020 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 14 October 2020 | 106 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 24TH FEBRUARY 1999
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY; A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHTS OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN, REGARDLESS OF RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, OR MEANS B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS C)INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIM OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Emma Butcher
Orton St.Johns Preschool
Riseholme
Orton Goldhay
PETERBOROUGH
PE2 5SP
- Phone:
- 01733230194
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window