Financial history SETTLE VICTORIA HALL LIMITED

Charity number: 1078166
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £271.64k £215.73k £507.26k £427.05k £364.41k
Total expenditure £287.61k £221.35k £479.28k £457.04k £369.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £206.46k £54.70k £11.24k £400
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £138.82k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £368.44k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £1 N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £283.62k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £5.51k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £4.50k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £5.51k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £190.15k N/A N/A