GORRAN AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY BUS ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community Bus based in St Goran, Cornwall
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £6,884 from 4 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- 30 August 2000: Standard registration
- GORRANBUS (Working name)
- GORRAN AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY BUS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT BAYLISS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Edmund Marshall Walsh | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew Sumner Stead | Trustee | 16 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JILL LYNDA BAYLISS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Peter John Fuller | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.72k | £73.53k | £17.50k | £23.03k | £29.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.22k | £15.69k | £16.55k | £21.86k | £18.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.02k | £11.43k | £10.69k | £7.97k | £6.88k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 JULY 2000 AS AMENDED 19 JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE RELIEF TO THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES OF ST GORAN AND ST. EWE AND THEIR ENVIRONS WHO HAVE NEED BECAUSE OF AGE, MENTAL OR PHYSICAL DISABILITY, OR POVERTY.
Area of benefit
ST GORAN AND ST EWE AND THEIR ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
KOPPERS
RICE LANE
GORRAN HAVEN
ST. AUSTELL
PL26 6JD
- Phone:
- 01726842733
- Email:
- secretary@gorranbus.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window