ROSEMARY KENDALL CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity Number: 1079438
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
n/a
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2007
Total income: £11,378
Total expenditure: £7,040
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
Registration history:
- 17 February 2000: Standard registration
- 11 June 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2004 | 05/04/2005 | 05/04/2006 | 05/04/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.10k | £9.13k | £9.75k | £11.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.22k | £10.21k | £9.07k | £7.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2007 | 07 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2007 | 13 November 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2006 | 15 September 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2005 | 18 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2004 | 26 November 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2004 | 26 November 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED 2 AUGUST 1999
Charitable objects
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NATIONAL
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window