FRIENDS OF CHESTER PARK INFANT SCHOOL
Charity Number: 1078564
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PTA organisation fund-raising for Chester Park Infant School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income: £32
Total expenditure: £0
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
- Bristol City
Governance
Registration history:
- 13 December 1999: Standard registration
- 25 March 2024: Removed (Transfer of funds)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- CHESTER PARK INFANT SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
- CHESTER PARK INFANT SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.71k | £2.97k | £18 | £78 | £32 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.52k | £1.20k | £631 | £4.44k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 12 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 08 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 MAY 1999 AS AMENDED 18 OCTOBER 1999 AND 11 OCTOBER 2010 AS AMENDED ON 05/10/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
CHESTER PARK INFANT SCHOOL.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window