HARAMBEE SCHOOLS KENYA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports and empowers communities; building schools and helping to maintain a quality education through the provision of school infrastructure, school lunches, desks, student bursary schemes, water harvesting, sanitation and teaching materials.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kenya
Governance
- 14 December 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael John Harris | Chair | 09 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mark Durston | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Long | Trustee | 19 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Owen | Trustee | 27 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Amie Willenberg | Trustee | 01 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.69k | £27.59k | £25.48k | £38.71k | £38.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.64k | £31.60k | £27.29k | £40.27k | £33.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 February 2025 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 February 2025 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2025 | 351 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2025 | 351 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 June 2022 | 145 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 June 2022 | 145 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 SEPTEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED BY A SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 18 NOVEMBER 1999, 5 APRIL 2005 AND 1 SEPTEMBER 2006. as amended on 10 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AT HARAMBEE (SELF HELP) PRIMARY AND SECONDARY AND TERTIARY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS, FUNDING OF CONSTRUCTION PROJECTS, BURSARIES, SALARIES FOR TEACHERS AND ANCILLARY STAFF AND ANY OTHER PURPOSE CAPABLE TO ADVANCING EDUCATION THAT THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 1
Fletcher Court
Salesbury Drive
Billericay
CM11 2JW
- Phone:
- 07949548876
- Email:
- amie@hsk.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window