Financial history MARKS TEY, ST. ANDREWS PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1077590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £350 £402 £2.86k £4.64k £9.74k
Total expenditure £320 £2.90k £1.04k £2.84k £2.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A