MAROA CHRISTIAN COUNSELLING INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We give counselling to married couples, We counsel, Parents with difficult children, Young and Teenagers, Premarital, Marriage Counselling, Grief and all except Drug and Alchohol addictions.Child care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2019
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Greenwich
- Hackney
- Nigeria
- United States
Governance
- 27 March 2000: Standard registration
- PENTECOSTAL REDEEMED MINISTRIES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADEKEMI OYINADE AOFOLAJU | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Pastor VICTORIA OLUREMI GEORGE | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH OLUFUNKE AOFOLAJU | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Pastor REBECCA OLAYINKA ADEOSUN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/09/2015 | 01/09/2016 | 01/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £800 | £210 | £120 | £108 | £225 | |
|
Total expenditure | £720 | £175 | £95 | £80 | £192 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 280 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 280 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 646 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 646 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1011 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1011 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1376 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1376 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 13 August 2020 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED 2 JULY 1999 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 23 SEPTEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND COUNSELLING IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND TRAINING (2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 CLOTHWORKERS ROAD
LONDON
SE18 2PD
- Phone:
- +442083167074
- Email:
- rebeccaadeosun@skyyahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window