Accounts and annual returns THE VOLUNTEER MISSIONARY MOVEMENT (EUROPE)

Charity number: 1078695
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 September 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2018 11 December 2019 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 11 December 2019 41 days late
Annual return 31 December 2017 07 December 2018 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 07 December 2018 37 days late