COUNCIL FOR BRITISH ARCHAEOLOGY EAST MIDLANDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The group runs activities to advance the education of the public in all aspects of archaeology.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derbyshire
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- Nottinghamshire
- Rutland
Governance
- 05 September 2000: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Simon Robert Neil Chenery | Chair | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul Dickinson | Trustee | 06 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS POVEY | Trustee | 26 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID INGHAM | Trustee | 24 March 2012 |
|
|||||
Carolyn Ann Chenery | Trustee | 24 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.81k | £2.22k | £2.80k | £997 | £1.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.45k | £1.27k | £1.27k | £1.12k | £1.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 200 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 200 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 November 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 MARCH 1999 AS AMENDED 4 MARCH 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF ARCHAEOLOGY IN, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN, THE ANCIENT COUNTIES OF DERBYSHIRE, LEICESTERSHIRE, LINCOLNSHIRE, NOTTINGHAMSHIRE AND RUTLAND
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE DERBYSHIRE, LEICESTERSHIRE, LINCOLNSHIRE, NOTTINGHAMSHIRE AND RUTLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 Brookside
Rearsby
Leicester
LE7 4YB
- Phone:
- 01664424379
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window