Governing document GLOSSOP COMMUNITY TRANSPORT
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 APRIL 1989, AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATES UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 6 SEPT 1993 AND 9 APR 1997 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 25 SEPT 2000, 22 MAR 2006 AND 14 JUL 2010.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE RELIEF TO THE INHABITANTS OF THE BOROUGH OF HIGH PEAK AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS WHO HAVE NEED THEREOF, AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT SO AS TO LIMIT THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING A) TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN NON-PROFIT COMMUNITY TRANSPORT SERVICES; AND B) TO ASSIST THE CHARITABLE WORK OF ORGANISATIONS AND BODIES ENGAGED IN PROMOTING THE RELIEF OF SUCH PERSONS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF APPROPRIATE SERVICES
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF HIGH PEAK AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.