SHOOTING STAR CANCER SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are the relief of sickness by the provision and equipping of an integrated specialist cancer treatment facility, including a specific area dedicated to services for women, at Wrexham Maelor Hospital.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 03 March 2000: Standard registration
- WREXHAM MAELOR HOSPITAL'S SHOOTING STAR APPEAL (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID PARRY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
DAVID SPALDING | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Sinclair | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zarina Kagan | Trustee | 03 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Wedley | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Edwin Mark Williams | Trustee | 25 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mark Common | Trustee | 20 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jenny Duguid | Trustee | 12 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Pye | Trustee | 12 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Lush | Trustee | 23 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
MOIRA JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD ALUN MORGAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL KENNETH HUGH CRUMPLIN MB BS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.54k | £55.30k | £68.18k | £70.98k | £85.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.70k | £12.78k | £101.68k | £84.88k | £70.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18 JANUARY 2000 as amended on 19 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY THE PROVISION AND EQUIPPING OF AN INTEGRATED SPECIALIST CANCER TREATMENT FACILITY, INCLUDING A SPECIFIC AREA DEDICATED TO SERVICES FOR WOMEN, AT WREXHAM MAELOR HOSPITAL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MD Coxey & Co Ltd
25 Grosvenor Road
WREXHAM
Clwyd
LL11 1BT
- Phone:
- 01978 291100
- Email:
- admin@mdcoxey.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window