GILL RISE PATIENTS' AMENITY FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 16 June 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Cumbria
- Lancashire
Governance
- 06 March 2000: Standard registration
- 14 January 2009: Removed (Voluntary removal)
- CONISTON WARD SUPPORT GROUP AMENITY FUND (Previous name)
- CONISTON WARD SUPPORT GROUP MINI BUS APPEAL FUND (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 16/06/2005 | 16/06/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £548 | £562 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.74k | £1.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 16 June 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 16 June 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 16 June 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 16 June 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 16 June 2006 | 04 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 June 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 16 June 2005 | 30 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 June 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 16 June 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 16 June 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 DECEMBER 1999, AMENDED ON 6 MAY 2002
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM A MENTAL ILLNESS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY RESIDING IN CONISTON WARD, ULVERSTON BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A MINIBUS AND IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window