BODY OF CHRIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity operates London,Notts.,Sheffield,Manchester,Lvpool.,Hamilton,Lanarkshire. Helping people in needs and expanding christian faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 December 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEREMY BLATCH | Trustee |
|
||||||
Joaquin Munt | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PASTOR JUAN MIGUEL DIEZ | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.00k | £1.55k | £1.50k | £1.50k | £2.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.90k | £1.55k | £1.50k | £1.50k | £2.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 15 August 2024 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 01 May 2023 | 275 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 11 August 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 12 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18 SEPTEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND THE WORSHIP OF GOD IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") BY ANY MEANS WHATSOEVER INCLUDING (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THE PREACHING AND PROCLAMATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL AND THE TEACHING OF CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE AND PRINCIPLES AND THE PASTORAL CARE OF CHRISTIAN PEOPLE AND THE PRINTING AND DISTRIBUTION OF THE BIBLE AND CHRISTIAN LITERATURE INCLUDING VIDEO AND AUDIO RECORDINGS OR TAPES AND BY ANY OTHER MEDIA WHICH IS OR MAY BECOME AVAILABLE 2. THE WORLDWIDE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK 3. THE WORLDWIDE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ON THE BASIS OF CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE PROVISIONS OF SUCH EDUCATION IN ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT AND IF THE TRUSTEES SO DECIDE THE PROVISION OF ONE OR MORE CHARITABLE EDUCATION ESTABLISHMENTS FOR THE GENERAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OR ADULTS ON THE BASIS OF SUCH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
845 HIGH ROAD
LEYTONSTONE
LONDON
E11 1HH
- Phone:
- 02085581660
- Email:
- remarlondon@btconnect.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window