THE JOLANTA AND MAX NEUFELD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In support of its general charitable objectives the trust have in the past year made donations to support charities active in protecting civil liberties and promoting penal reform.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 May 2000: Standard registration
- STET (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Deborah Alison Saunt | Chair | 13 January 2018 |
|
|||||
Bartholomew Preston | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Judah Rosenberg | Trustee | 18 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Colin Hayward | Trustee | 13 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN MAX NEUFELD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.21k | £41.21k | £40.79k | £48.81k | £40.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.66k | £43.66k | £35.00k | £36.28k | £39.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 10 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 10 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 30 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2ND SEPTEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
(A) TO SUPPORT THE FURTHERANCE OR ADVANCEMENT OR BENEFIT OF SUCH ON OR MORE CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME SELECT PROVIDED THAT NO FUNDS MAY BE APPLIED FOR ANY PURPOSE WHICH IS NOT CHARITABLE (B) TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF GREATER LONDON AND OF THE NATION AT LARGE THE BUILDINGS AND OTHER PARTS OF THE ARCHITECTURAL, CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE AS MAY EXIST IN AND AROUND THE AREA OF FITZROVIA WHERE THEY ARE OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY, HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 13
Sawmill Studios
19 Parr Street
LONDON
N1 7GW
- Phone:
- 02034174031
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window