Financial history ALLEXTON / NEW PARKS JUNIOR FOOTBALL CLUB SUPPORTERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1082323
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £52.26k £7.18k £8.92k £9.25k £803
Total expenditure £28.55k £7.86k £32.21k £25.14k £4.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A