MENAI BRIDGE COMMUNITY HERITAGE TRUST LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust runs an accredited museum in a renovated historic building. It offers outreach and educational activities. The collection of artefacts and documents relates to the two Menai bridges. The Trustees are working towards moving the museum to a permanent waterfront location in Menai Bridge The current building also operates as a community centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,859 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Isle Of Anglesey
Governance
- 14 August 2000: Standard registration
- PROSIECT MENAI (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter George Alexander | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Robert David Borsley | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marc Collinson | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lowri Ann Rees | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Leigh Roberts | Trustee | 31 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Joy Porter | Trustee | 12 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Poulton | Trustee | 13 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Adele Evans | Trustee | 11 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Jones | Trustee | 18 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
John Stuart Cole | Trustee | 22 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.44k | £51.38k | £39.63k | £24.63k | £28.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.73k | £26.30k | £44.28k | £25.87k | £30.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £42.73k | £20.25k | £4.49k | £2.86k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24/11/97, AS AMENDED 27 SEPTEMBER 2002 AND AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF 13 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT FOR WHICH THE TRUST IS ESTABLISHED IS TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE TOWNSPEOPLE OF THE DISTRICT OF MENAI BRIDGE IN THE COUNTY OF YNYS MON AND OF THE NATION AT LARGE WHATEVER OF THE HISTORICAL ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE MAY EXIST IN AND AROUND THE DISTRICT OF MENAI BRIDGE AFORESAID IN THE FORM OF BUILDINGS (INCLUDING ANY BUILDINGS AS DEFINED IN SECTION 336(1) OF THE TOWN AND COUNTRY PLANNING ACT 1990) OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF YNYS MON
Contact information
- Address:
-
CANOLFAN THOMAS TELFORD
MONA ROAD
MENAI BRIDGE
ANGLESEY
LL59 5EA
- Phone:
- 01248715046
- Email:
- info@menaiheritage.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window