Financial history THE INNER WHEEL CLUB OF BREWOOD & DISTRICT BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 1078413
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £3.59k £495 £2.26k £2.46k £3.38k
Total expenditure £2.11k £1.66k £2.48k £2.11k £3.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A