Governing document SOCIETY FOR VASCULAR TECHNOLOGY OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Charity Number: 1080367

Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10/09/1999 AS AMENDED ON 01/03/2000 AS AMENDED ON 23/11/2011 AS AMENDED ON 23 NOV 2017 as amended on 26 Nov 2020 as amended on 26 Nov 2020 as amended on 23 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING TRAINING AND RESEARCH IN VASCULAR TECHNOLOGY AND TO DISSEMINATE THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.