THE ACORNS PRE-SCHOOL (BOWER HINTON)

Charity Number: 1078218
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To enhance the development and education of children under statutory school age by offering appropriate play, education and care facilities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £46,758
Total expenditure: £37,280

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 November 1999: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nicola Jane Dyer Chair 13 March 2024
None on record
Fiona Waldron Trustee 15 June 2023
None on record
Chantelle Dyer Trustee 15 June 2023
None on record
AMY KEMPSTER Trustee 14 June 2023
None on record
Helen White Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £33.91k £24.82k £25.55k £28.10k £46.76k
Total expenditure £35.03k £29.51k £32.06k £34.40k £37.28k
Income from government contracts £28.59k N/A £19.91k £19.96k £43.40k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £1.60k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 21 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 21 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 25 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 27 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 26 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 26 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
United Reform Church
Bower Hinton
MARTOCK
Somerset
TA12 6LA
Phone:
07599981932