Trustees BATTICALOA UNDERPRIVILEGED DEVELOPMENT SOCIETY ( B U D S )
Charity number: 1081305

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Alan Kangatharan | Chair | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sivagnana Thayaparan | Trustee | 02 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Subaskaran Savarimuthu | Trustee | 02 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nagarajah Rameshprabahar | Trustee | 02 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Britto Jeyakumar Sinnathamby | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
SUMAN SANGARAVEL | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nihal Thevarajan | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Umashanger Velauthampillai | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Arasaratnam Uththerakunaseelan | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sureshkumar Senathirajah | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sivananthan Balamurali | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Suja KOREIRA | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roshan Rajaratnam | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Muriet Mariampillai | Trustee | 03 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
MR Sandrasegaram Umachandra | Trustee | 17 February 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.