BRISTOL VINTAGE BUS GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing the education of the public by increasing knowledge and interest in all aspects of transport heritage and particularly in historic buses of the Bristol area. The charity has a collection of buses which it preserves, restores and maintains and uses for rallies and events to promote the transport heritage of the area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 27 October 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ricky Long | Chair | 11 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Julian Sommer | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aled Jonathan Rees | Trustee | 30 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Andrew John Hughes | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Maurice Avery | Trustee | 24 March 2014 |
|
|||||
Dayley Patrick Gerald Lawrence | Trustee | 07 February 2012 |
|
|||||
PAUL VINCENT TOVEY | Trustee | 20 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAVID LESLIE WITHERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LIONEL TANCOCK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.37k | £47.86k | £12.16k | £25.55k | £19.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.61k | £12.38k | £20.52k | £20.02k | £28.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £37.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 08 November 2024 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 11 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/09/1999 AS AMENDED ON 17/09/2000 AS AMENDED ON 27/03/2006 AS AMENDED ON 05/02/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY INCREASING KNOWLEDGE AND INTEREST IN ALL ASPECTS OF TRANSPORT HERITAGE AND PARTICULARLY IN HISTORIC BUSES OF THE BRISTOL AREA.
Area of benefit
BRISTOL AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bristol Vintage Bus Group
Unit H
Flowers Hill
BRISTOL
BS4 5JJ
- Phone:
- 07854949105
- Email:
- secretary@bvbg.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window