CASPARI FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide educational psychotherapy for children & young people enabling vulnerable children to learn. Provide training/inset days in the field of educational psychotherapy for other professionals. Deliver MA/Diploma course in educational psychotherapy. Provide shorter other part time courses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £30,627 from 6 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 February 2000: Standard registration
- THE CASPARI FOUNDATION FOR EDUCATIONAL THERAPY AND THERAPEUTIC TEACHING (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sona Modi | Trustee | 02 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
The Hon Luke James Palmer | Trustee | 11 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Reid | Trustee | 18 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lee Marsden | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Josuha Max Bradbury Swirsky | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.57k | £98.70k | £111.37k | £110.48k | £111.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £117.28k | £111.57k | £116.02k | £132.27k | £119.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £30.63k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 06 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 06 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23RD JULY 1999, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16TH FEBRUARY 2000
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN EDUCATIONAL THERAPY AND THERAPEUTIC TEACHING (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND RELIEF OF SUFFERING OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO HAVE LEARNING DIFFICULTIES CAUSED BY EMOTIONAL FACTORS, BY THE PROVISION OF THERAPEUTIC TEACHING AND EDUCATIONAL THERAPY, THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE PRACTICE OF SUCH TEACHING AND THERAPY, AND RESEARCH INTO THE SUBJECT OF EDUCATION FOR SUCH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE PROVIDED THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH ARE PUBLISHED OR OTHERWISE DISSEMINATED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Riley Studios
724 Holloway Road
LONDON
N19 3JD
- Phone:
- 02075275161
- Email:
- hello@caspari.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window