JOHN RAY MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Care and maintainance of the Millennium Green, (Three acres), to provide a biodiverse green area with open cut areas and paths and wooded edges with shrub margins
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 06 October 1999: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Black Notley Parish Council | Trustee | 06 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.50k | £2.00k | £3.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.85k | £2.34k | £2.39k | £437 | £1.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21ST SEPTEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN AN OPEN SPACE TO BE KNOWN AS "JOHN RAY MILLENNIUM GREEN" FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS AND TO BE USED FOREVER AS AN AREA FOR INFORMAL RECREATION PLAY OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS A MEETING AREA OR PLACE FOR COMMUNITY EVENTS AND FOR OTHER LAWFUL PURPOSE CONSISTENT WITH THESE TRUSTS AND FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
BLACK NOTLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
CLERK TO THE PARISH COUNCIL OF BLAC
MRS HELEN WATERFIELD
26 Bulford Close
Cressing
BRAINTREE
CM77 8HH
- Phone:
- 01376550309
- Email:
- info@blacknotley-pc.gov.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window