BEDFORDSHIRE REFUGEE AND ASYLUM SEEKER SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a charity run by one paid co-ordinator and six and volunteers with an overall executive committee. We provide 2 drop in advice surgeries, an English Language Befriending project and an annual Summer outing, a women's social group and other social activities We also provide regular website updates for our contacts and our service users.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
53 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 07 April 2003: Standard registration
- BRASS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MORRIS JOHNS | Chair | 22 September 2016 |
|
|||||||
Jo Tester | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Sandra Howes | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
James Biggs | Trustee | 22 October 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Sanja Radic | Trustee | 28 February 2012 |
|
|
||||||
VICTORIA HILLIARD | Trustee | 14 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £162.39k | £161.07k | £122.13k | £142.26k | £190.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £150.10k | £158.76k | £170.70k | £165.28k | £175.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £32.00k | £35.17k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £35.17k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 OCTOBER 1999 AS AMENDED 18 SEPTEMBER 2002 AND 5 MARCH 2003.
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS IN THE COUNTY OF BEDFORDSHIRE TO ASSIST IN THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
BEDFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O 27B TAVISTOCK STREET
BEDFORD
MK40 2RB
- Phone:
- 01234211381
- Email:
- info@brass27b.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window