SPORTSABLE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of sports facilities and opportunities for the physically and sensorially disabled in the south and the south east.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
Total income includes £50,000 from 1 government contract(s) and £50,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bracknell Forest
- Buckinghamshire
- Hampshire
- Reading
- Slough
- Surrey
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 23 December 1999: Standard registration
- 12 December 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SPORTSABLE (Working name)
- WAMDSAD (Working name)
- WAMDSAD LTD (Working name)
- WINDSOR ASCOT MAIDENHEAD DISTRICT SPORTS ASSOCIATION FOR THE DISABLED (Previous name)
- WINDSOR ASCOT MAIDENHEAD DISTRIST SPORTS ASSOCIATION FOR THE DISABLED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £240.49k | £259.39k | £289.94k | £348.98k | £229.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £249.11k | £286.05k | £333.02k | £331.84k | £320.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | £50.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £3.60k | £1.50k | £50.00k | £50.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
29 August 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 22 July 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 22 July 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 DECEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 AUG 2017 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27 OCT 2017 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF AND ADVANCEMENT OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES (PARTICULARLY THE PHYSICALLY AND SENSORIALLY DISABLED) AND THEIR FAMILIES, ACROSS ENGLAND, WALES, SCOTLAND AND NORTHERN IRELAND, THROUGH A NETWORK OF SOCIALS CLUBS, MULTI-SPORTS CENTRES AND OUTREACH PROGRAMMES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY · FOSTERING A SAFE ENVIRONMENT CONDUCIVE TO THE PARTICULAR PHYSICAL AND PSYCHOLOGICAL NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES; · PROVIDING A SAFE ENVIRONMENT FOR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES AND THEIR FAMILIES TO MEET OTHERS GOING THROUGH THE SAME OR SIMILAR LIFE EXPERIENCES; AND · PROVIDING COMPETITIVE AND NON-COMPETITIVE SPORT AND SOCIAL ACTIVITIES.”
Area of benefit
WINDSOR, ASCOT AND MAIDENHEAD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window