Financial history BRIDGES CENTRE

Charity number: 1079085
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.13m £1.05m £1.00m £1.22m £1.11m
Total expenditure £1.01m £943.85k £1.07m £1.23m £1.16m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £24.62k £87.85k
Income from government grants £557.49k £110.96k £62.10k £686.56k £504.13k
Income - Donations and legacies £29.13k £5.57k £18.83k £26.61k £25.28k
Income - Other trading activities £67.96k £10.76k £35.73k £68.48k £94.87k
Income - Charitable activities £1.03m £1.03m £942.74k £1.12m £981.57k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £416 £273 £430 £2.56k £5.11k
Income - Other £4.93k £2.87k £4.12k £5.11k £5.06k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.01m £943.85k £1.07m £1.23m £1.16m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £4.11k £3.68k £0 £26.53k £16.67k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £272 £0 £0