BRIDGES CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bridges is a vital hub for local activity and aims to provide bridges between different sections of the community. It has over 60 activities, support groups, courses and clubs meeting every week. It runs 3 important community projects, provides a base for charities and also offers start up units for small businesses. It attracts over 1,000 users and visitors every week.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,111,887
Donations and legacies | £25.28k | |
Charitable activities | £981.57k | |
Other trading activities | £94.87k | |
Investments | £5.11k | |
Other | £5.06k |
Total expenditure:
£1,159,897
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.16m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £87,845 from 4 government contract(s) and £504,130 from 4 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.16m |
People

54 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
450 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Monmouthshire
Governance
- 25 January 2000: Standard registration
- BRIDGES COMMUNITY CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARY ANN ROSSER | Chair | 26 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Julie Boothroyd | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susan Eldridge | Trustee | 06 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Pospisil | Trustee | 06 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roger Hoggins | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
MRS JANE DUKE | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
MRS JANE GUNTER | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Walton | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|||||
GEOFF QUINN | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN BARRY GIBSON | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.13m | £1.05m | £1.00m | £1.22m | £1.11m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.01m | £943.85k | £1.07m | £1.23m | £1.16m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £24.62k | £87.85k | |
|
Income from government grants | £557.49k | £110.96k | £62.10k | £686.56k | £504.13k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £29.13k | £5.57k | £18.83k | £26.61k | £25.28k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £67.96k | £10.76k | £35.73k | £68.48k | £94.87k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.03m | £1.03m | £942.74k | £1.12m | £981.57k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £416 | £273 | £430 | £2.56k | £5.11k | |
|
Income - Other | £4.93k | £2.87k | £4.12k | £5.11k | £5.06k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.01m | £943.85k | £1.07m | £1.23m | £1.16m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £4.11k | £3.68k | £0 | £26.53k | £16.67k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £272 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £340.70k | £331.67k | £259.59k | £180.53k | £107.91k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £312.08k | £535.63k | £468.59k | £561.64k | £493.43k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £43.24k | £147.70k | £78.14k | £99.36k | £92.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 OCT 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 NOV 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 JAN 2000 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11 JUN 2016 as amended on 01 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF MONMOUTH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, COLOUR, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS, IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS. 2) TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME, WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON, OR BODY IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
MONMOUTH & NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Drybridge Park
MONMOUTH
NP25 5AS
- Phone:
- 01600228660
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.