Trustees BRIDGES CENTRE
Charity number: 1079085

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARY ANN ROSSER | Chair | 26 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Alison Beard-Gunter | Trustee | 06 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Julie Boothroyd | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susan Eldridge | Trustee | 06 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Pospisil | Trustee | 06 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roger Hoggins | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
MRS JANE DUKE | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
MRS JANE GUNTER | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Walton | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|||||
GEOFF QUINN | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN BARRY GIBSON | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.