THE SICK DOCTORS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Offers help and advice to doctors addicted to alcohol & drugs. Also advice & support to relatives. Works to promote understanding of the illness amongst the profession.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

18 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 April 2000: Standard registration
- ADDICTIVE PHYSICIAN'S PROGRAMME (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr David Barker | Chair | 27 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Jane Ellison | Trustee | 29 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Katharine Williams | Trustee | 29 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helen Stinson | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Claire Nelson | Trustee | 25 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amulya Misra | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Toby Branfoot | Trustee | 26 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janusz Skrybant | Trustee | 22 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
DR Cathryn Jacob | Trustee | 24 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Dougan | Trustee | 04 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Catherine Dent | Trustee | 24 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR Elizabeth Croton | Trustee | 18 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Adam Farmer | Trustee | 18 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mark Wrigley | Trustee | 18 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
DR RUTH MARGARET MAYALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALASDAIR YOUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JACQUI CHANG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR JONATHAN HYATT WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.20k | £5.57k | £6.02k | £6.98k | £12.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.80k | £2.55k | £8.46k | £9.04k | £8.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION CONVERSION 23 FEB 2021 as amended on 08 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AND SHALL BE TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF MEDICAL PRACTITIONERS AND OTHERS IN THE MEDICAL PROFESSION WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM THE EFFECTS OF DRUGS OR ALCOHOL ABUSE, PRESSURE AT WORK OR OTHER DISTRESS AND OF THE FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PRACTITIONERS AND OTHERS IN THE MEDICAL PROFESSION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2/1 57 Fotheringay Road
GLASGOW
G41 4NN
- Phone:
- 07779629698
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window