Trustees THE SICK DOCTORS TRUST
Charity Number: 1080327

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr David Barker | Chair | 27 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Jane Ellison | Trustee | 29 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Katharine Williams | Trustee | 29 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helen Stinson | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Claire Nelson | Trustee | 25 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amulya Misra | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Toby Branfoot | Trustee | 26 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janusz Skrybant | Trustee | 22 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
DR Cathryn Jacob | Trustee | 24 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Dougan | Trustee | 04 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Catherine Dent | Trustee | 24 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR Elizabeth Croton | Trustee | 18 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Adam Farmer | Trustee | 18 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mark Wrigley | Trustee | 18 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
DR RUTH MARGARET MAYALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALASDAIR YOUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JACQUI CHANG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR JONATHAN HYATT WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.