THE PAKISTAN WELFARE ASSOCIATION-THE PAKISTAN CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WOMEN GROUP CLASSES SENIOR CITIZEN SESSION CITIZEN ADVICE SURGERY PRE-BOOKED COMMUNITY SOCIAL EVENTS & YOUTH ACTIVITES ADVICE IN PERSON OR OVER THE PHONE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

25 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Brent
Governance
- 12 October 2001: Standard registration
- THE PAKISTAN CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
25 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TARIQ MAHMOOD DAR | Chair |
|
||||||
Iftkhar Raja | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jameel Anwar | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anila Nisar | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Akib Mahmood | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nosheen Munawar Dar | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Atif Nazir | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Syma Mir Hussain | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Altaf | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dil Mohammad Choudry | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Raja Umair Amin | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Anwar Hussain | Trustee | 22 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amjad Riaz | Trustee | 22 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
ZAFAR IQBAL | Trustee | 26 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Qureshi | Trustee | 24 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
BILAL BASHIR | Trustee | 24 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMAD ASHRAF DAR | Trustee | 30 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMAD AZAM CHOUDRY | Trustee | 14 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMAD AKRAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SAFDAR HUSSAIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ARIF KHAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MUNAWWAR HUSSAIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NAZIR AHMED NAZIR | Trustee |
|
||||||
MAHMOOD ANWAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IFTIKHAR AHMAD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.82k | £44.05k | £41.48k | £71.75k | £26.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.45k | £34.22k | £31.56k | £64.89k | £28.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 June 2024 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 June 2024 | 125 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11/02/2001 AS AMENDED ON 28/09/2003 AS AMENDED ON 26/09/2004 AS AMENDED ON 23/09/2012
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE BY THE MAINTENANCE AND DEVELOPMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE KNOWN AS THE PAKISTAN CENTRE. (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR, IN THE ARTS, CUSTOMS, HISTORY AND LANGUAGE OF PAKISTAN. (C) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF AN ACTIVE ADVICE AND COUNSELLING SERVICE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pakistan Community Centre
Marley Walk
Off Station Parade
Willesden Green
London
NW2 4PU
- Phone:
- 020 3161 9495
- Email:
- pakcc47@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window