Accounts and annual returns KONNECT

Charity Number: 1078684
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2014 27 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 13 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 28 November 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required